Szpakowski, Pawel Piotr (CPSO#: 84866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V0A4
Phone: 519-421-4211
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chmiel Szpakowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Szpakowski ( CPSO# 84866 )
Dr. A. Chmiel ( CPSO# 77768 )

Business Address:
Regional Rehabilitation
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 05 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAWEL PIOTR SZPAKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZPAKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2008