Szpurko, Ashley Laura (CPSO#: 90648)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Haematology/Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 29 Feb 2016 to 24 Mar 2016
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Mar 2016