Champagne, Trevor (CPSO#: 95271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
R.K. Schachter Dermatology Centre
76 Grenville St, Toronto, ON
5th floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-7546
Fax: 416-323-6236
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

FL 8 East, Room 471
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416 603 5952
Fax: 416 603 2782
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chuang and Dr. Champagne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Champagne ( CPSO# 95271 )
Dr. R. Chuang ( CPSO# 95273 )

Business Address:
2025 Midland Avenue
Toronto ON  M1P 3E4
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Business Address:
1450 O'Connor Drive
Toronto ON  M4B 1Z1
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Business Address:
Front Frederick Health
Suite 1400
365 Bloor Street East
14th Floor
Toronto ON  M4W 3L4
Phone Number: (416) 362-8777

Business Address:
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
Suite 602
500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7

Business Address:
701 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 304
Toronto ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone Number: (416) 590-9918

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
R.K. Schachter Dermatology Centre
76 Grenville Street
5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7546

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TREVOR CHAMPAGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMPAGNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016