Taabazuing, Mary-Margaret (CPSO#: 85612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
Department of Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London, ON, N6A 5W9
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 57032
Fax: 5196858813
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Taabazuing Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Taabazuing ( CPSO# 85612 )

Business Address:
LHSC - Victoria Hospital
Department of Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 12 May 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY-MARGARET TAABAZUING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAABAZUING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2009