Tabari, Mohammad (CPSO#: 87032)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
414 - 3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 439-2662 Ext. 2
Fax: (416) 439-2552
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Tabari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tabari ( CPSO# 87032 )

Business Address:
414-3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 439-2662

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Jul 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD TABARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TABARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 28 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010