Tabassum, Farah (CPSO#: 73494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: Tabassum, Farah Jabeen (used until: 31 May 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1700 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 4C3
Phone: (416) 604-3361
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Main Floor
77 Grenville St
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARAH TABASSUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TABASSUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2001