Tabassum, Farah (CPSO#: 90227)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 13 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Feb 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016