Tabib, Mohamed Ahmed (CPSO#: 75356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Spanish

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1995 Lens Ave
2224 Walker RD, Suite 160.
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 52796
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Tabib Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tabib ( CPSO# 75356 )

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 566-6055

Business Address:
160 - 2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  M8W 5L7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED AHMED TABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TABIB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 08 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2006