Tabloie, Farshid (CPSO#: 79733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Athlete's Care
Unit # 7
2535 Major MacKenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 1C6
Phone: (905) 303-0760
Fax: (905) 303-1476
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand Genesis Health
Richmond Hill Med. & Surg. Centre
9080 Yonge Street
Level 2
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Canada
Phone: (289) 597-7676
Fax: (289)597-7675
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farshid Tabloie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Tabloie ( CPSO# 79733 )
Dr. P. Seyed Akhavan ( CPSO# 80322 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital - Grace Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2600

Business Address:
Athlete's Care
7 - 2535 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 1C6
Phone Number: (905) 303-0760

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-2911

Business Address:
Grand Genesis Health
Richmond Hill Medical & Surgical Centre
9080 Yonge Street
Level 2
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone Number: (289) 597-7676

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Urgent Care Centre
110 Copper Creek Drive
Suite 100
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-8911

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 02 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARSHID TABLOIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TABLOIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Nov 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009