Tabor, Thomas Kyle (CPSO#: 88637)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 701
440 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E5
Phone: (519) 601-7577
Fax: (519) 601-7737
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.K. Tabor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tabor ( CPSO# 88637 )

Business Address:
440 Central Avenue
Suite 701
London ON  N6B 2E5
Phone Number: (519) 601-7577

Business Address:
355 Wellington Street
PO Box 23055
London ON  N6A 3N9
Phone Number: (519) 850-5335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS KYLE TABOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TABOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2010