Tadrous, Zakaria Lamie Tenious (CPSO#: 80040)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 25 Aug 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2003 to 21 Aug 2003
PEAP - Resident - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 25 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 25 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 2010