Taerk, Evan (CPSO#: 90932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ONE Fertility
McMaster University
3210 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone: (905) 634-4440
Fax: (905) 639-3810
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Evan Taerk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Taerk ( CPSO# 90932 )

Business Address:
ONE Fertility
McMaster University
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Phone Number: (905) 634-4440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVAN TAERK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAERK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014