Taggart, Linda Rose (CPSO#: 86688)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
4 Cardinal Carter North Room 4 179
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5568
Fax: (416) 864-5310
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA ROSE TAGGART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAGGART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2011