Taha, Adel Abdulla Abdulaziz (CPSO#: 71883)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Resident 8 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002