Taher, Fakhruddin (CPSO#: 64606)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
Queensway Site
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A4
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jivanji-Taher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jivanji ( CPSO# 79843 )
Dr. F. Taher ( CPSO# 64606 )

Business Address:
106-250 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1I2
Phone Number: (905) 275-2273

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
Queensway Site
200-150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4196

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAKHRUDDIN TAHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Aug 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1993