Taher, Floura Samih Mustapha (CPSO#: 98908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  22 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PEAP - Clinical Fellow as of 05 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Jordan, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Pediatric Medicine
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6933
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FLOURA SAMIH MUSTAPHA TAHER may practise medicine only:

(a) in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the University of Toronto to which the holder is appointed, and only as part of a system in which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the program to that clinical teaching unit;

(b) to the extent required to complete the Pre-entry Assessment Program to which the holder is appointed; and

(c) under a level of supervision that is determined to be appropriate for the holder and the program of medical education and assessment, by a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario designated by the director of the program.

(2) Dr. TAHER may not charge a fee for medical services.

(3) This certificate expires when Dr. TAHER is no longer enrolled in the Pre-entry Assessment Program specified in paragraph (1), which may be no less than four weeks and no more than twelve weeks in duration

Note: This certificate is issued on 05 Jul 2018 and expires on 22 Sep 2018, or when Dr. TAHER's enrolment in the Pre-entry Assessment Program ends, whichever occurs first.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 07 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 22 Sep 2018
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2018