Taher, Zaki Adnan (CPSO#: 92291)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 11 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 30 Nov 2009 to 13 Dec 2009
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Aug 2012