Tahiliani, Manoj (CPSO#: 77454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104A
300 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K1
Phone: (905) 245-0616
Fax: (905) 245-0618
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manoj Tahiliani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tahiliani ( CPSO# 77454 )

Business Address:
104A - 300 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K1
Phone Number: (905) 245-0616

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANOJ TAHILIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHILIANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Jun 2002 to 28 Jun 2002
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004