Tahir, Laeeq Ahmad (CPSO#: 80542)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Islamia University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2007