Tai, Christine Joan Yee-Jen (CPSO#: 89932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McNeely Medical Clinic
455 McNeely Avenue
Carleton Place ON  K7C 4S6
Phone: (613) 253-2233
Fax: (613) 253-4595
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE JOAN YEE-JEN TAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2012