Tai, Ray-Wen Melissa (CPSO#: 66947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
suite 309
29 Gervais Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1Z1
Phone: (416) 385-3431
Fax: (416) 385-1945
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Tai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tai ( CPSO# 66947 )

Business Address:
29 Gervais Drive
Suite 309
Toronto ON  M3C 1Z1
Phone Number: (416) 385-3431

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAY-WEN MELISSA TAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998