Takahashi Monroy, Takeshi (CPSO#: 75950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 119
700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone: (519) 419-0792
Fax: (519) 419-0793
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAKESHI TAKAHASHI MONROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKAHASHI MONROY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2008