Takrouri, Heba Sadeq Rabah (CPSO#: 92281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 May 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Jordan, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Radiology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75298
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alnassar and Takrouri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alnassar ( CPSO# 87135 )
Dr. H. Takrouri ( CPSO# 92281 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Corporation Name: Heba Takrouri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alnassar ( CPSO# 87135 )
Dr. H. Takrouri ( CPSO# 92281 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Radiology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z6
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Jordan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 May 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2009 to 03 Feb 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Heba Sadeq Raba Takrouri may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Radiology,  McMaster  University,  in  which  Dr. Takrouri holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  when  Dr. Takrouri
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.