Talab, Hesham Fathy Ali (CPSO#: 90112)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Department of Anesthesiology TOH
501 Smyth RD
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 71887
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Talab Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Talab ( CPSO# 90112 )

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Suite CCW1402
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Department of Anesthesiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite B309
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HESHAM FATHY ALI TALAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALAB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2009 to 02 Feb 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 03 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015