Talsky, Mark Aaron (CPSO#: 92458)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2010 to 14 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 16 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010