Talukdar, Momtaz Helal (CPSO#: 84974)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Chittagong, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph North End Family Medical
Suite 211
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 780-0375
Fax: (519) 780-0080
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Student Health Sevices
50 Stone Road East
University of Guelph
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Canada
Phone: (519) 824-4120 Ext. 54333
Fax: (519) 836-7431
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Momtaz H. Talukdar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Talukdar ( CPSO# 84974 )

Business Address:
Guelph North End Family Medical
211 - 83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 780-0375

Business Address:
University of Guelph
Student Health Services
50 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 824-4120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Bangladesh

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOMTAZ HELAL TALUKDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALUKDAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008