Talukdar, Nayana (CPSO#: 94839)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Gauhati University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2011 to 11 May 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 12 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016