Tam, Alan Ka Ho (CPSO#: 95165)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Rehabiliation Institute
Room 10-107
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 3865
Fax: 416-597-7107
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-864-5520
Fax: 416-864-6098
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tam ( CPSO# 95165 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Rehabiliation Institute
Room 10-107
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5520

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN KA HO TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016