Tam, Amy Shuk-Ming (CPSO#: 77985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4370 Ext. 3512
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amy Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tam ( CPSO# 77985 )

Business Address:
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
P.O. Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 26 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY SHUK-MING TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006