Tam, Eric Siu Lung (CPSO#: 72341)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uptown Eye Specialists
7900 Hurontario Street
Unit 401
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Phone: 416-292-0330 Ext. 1
Fax: 416-292-0331
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Uptown Eye Specialists
2101 Brimley Road, Unit 109
Scarborough ON  M1S 2B4
Canada
Phone: 416-292-0330 Ext. 3
Fax: 416-292-0331
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital Eye Clinic
600 University Ave., Rm 411
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5151
Fax: (416) 586-8789
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Uptown Eye Specialists
221-2180 Steeles Ave. West
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Canada
Phone: 416-292-0330 Ext. 2
Fax: 416-292-0331
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eric S. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tam ( CPSO# 72341 )

Business Address:
411 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
401 - 7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Phone Number: (905) 456-9500

Business Address:
221 - 2180 Steeles Avenue West
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone Number: (905) 761-7002

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC SIU LUNG TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003