Tam, Julian Siuhong (CPSO#: 92464)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal University Hospital
Ellis Hall 5th Floor
103 Hospital Drive
Saskatoon SK  S7N 0W8
Phone: (306) 844-1009
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Adult Cystic Fibrosis Centre
6th Floor Bond Wing
30 Bond St
M5B 1W8
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-864-5409
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIAN SIUHONG TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 08 Feb 2010 to 07 Mar 2010
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Aug 2010 to 29 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 28 Feb 2013
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2014 to 20 Apr 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2015