Tam, Lai-Shan (CPSO#: 73122)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Aug 1999
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 1999