Tam, Mandy Man Yin (CPSO#: 95376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
109 King St West
Dundas
Ontario
L9H 1V1
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone: (905) 628-9200
Fax: (905) 628-9600
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mandy M.Y. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tam ( CPSO# 95376 )
Dr. B. Chan ( CPSO# 98360 )

Business Address:
109 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone Number: (905) 628-9200


Corporation Name: Brian J. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tam ( CPSO# 95376 )
Dr. B. Chan ( CPSO# 98360 )

Business Address:
826 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1L6
Phone Number: (905) 549-6123

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANDY MAN YIN TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013