Tam, Wilfred Herbie Garcia (CPSO#: 90538)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Medical Centre
1A Princess Anne Drive
Suite 204
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4
Phone: (905)703-1480
Fax: (905) 390-3578
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905)521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 9055212100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wilfred Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Tam ( CPSO# 90538 )

Business Address:
1 Yonge Street
Suite 419
Hamilton ON  L5N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 529-4400

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 389-4411

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILFRED HERBIE GARCIA TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014