Tamale, John Roland (CPSO#: 84029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ganda

Education:Makerere Univ, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
238 Grand River Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2N7
Phone: (519) 442-7400
Fax: (519) 442-1444
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John R Tamale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tamale ( CPSO# 84029 )

Business Address:
238 Grand River Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2N7
Phone Number: (519) 442-7400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

South Africa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROLAND TAMALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMALE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2006