Tamari, Erez (CPSO#: 52558)

Current Status: Suspended as of 13 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 May 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 6 - 2111 Dunwin Drive, Mississauga, Ontario, L5L 3C1, Tel: 905-828-0990, Fax: 905-828-1043.
Date Received: 04 Oct 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 May 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 May 2012
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 18 Jun 2012
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 16 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 31 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 13 Jun 2018
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 13 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 13 Jun 2018


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 13 Jun 2018 Active

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Jun 2018
Summary:

On June 13, 2018, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the 
College) found that Dr. Erez Tamari has committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has 
engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Tamari is a family physician. For approximately 30 years, Dr. Tamari operated a family medicine 
practice in Mississauga, and held hospital privileges at a Hospital in Mississauga. 
 
Conduct with Patients 
 
Patient A 
 
Patient A and his family were Dr. Tamari’s patients for more than 20 years. In May 2014, Patient A 
complained to the College about Dr. Tamari’s conduct and practice management in relation to him and to his 
family in 2013 and 2014, including concerns about having to physically attend at Dr. Tamari’s office to 
schedule appointments because of blocked/restricted telephone access to his office. As a result, the family 
found a new family physician. By letter dated March 10, 2014, Patient A advised Dr. Tamari of the decision 
to leave his practice and requested copies of medical records, providing signed consents. Patient A and his 
family’s records were provided to the College on July 25, 2014, after Patient A’s contact with the College.   
 
Patient B 
 
Patient B, a woman in her 50s, who had been a long-standing patient of Dr. Tamari has a past medical 
history of a workplace injury in late 2013. At an appointment in May 2014, Patient B requested Dr. Tamari 
to complete a medical report for her disability insurance claim. In August 2014, Dr. Tamari provided partial 
copies of select test results to insurance company; however, medical information remained outstanding at the 
time of Patient B’s complaint to the College in February 2015, despite repeated requests. In August 2014, 
Patient B requested transfer to another family doctor’s practice. This doctor made written requests for 
Patient B’s medical records from Dr. Tamari in August and October 2014; no response was received. In 
January 2015, after telephoning Dr. Tamari’s office again, Dr. Tamari faxed 115 pages of Patient B’s 
medical records, but the records did not include any clinical encounter notes. In June 2015, upon request of 
the College investigator, the insurance company confirmed that requested documentation was still missing, 
including clinical/chart notes, recent specialist consultation reports and tests/investigations. On February 18, 
2015, the College investigator notified Dr. Tamari of the complaint and requested Dr. Tamari’s response and 
Patient B’s original office records for 2014-2015. On April 16, 2015, Dr. Tamari’s counsel advised that 
Patient B’s paper chart was destroyed after Dr. Tamari’s conversion to an electronic medical record-keeping 
system, and that the electronic file containing Patient B’s recent records was corrupted and could not be 
opened. The available records were provided to the College. 
 
Patient C 
 
Patient C was a long-standing patient of Dr. Tamari until August 2015, when he relocated to another 
country. In June 2016, Patient C complained to the College of his concerns regarding Dr. Tamari’s failure to 
provide his medical records to his physician in another country in order to obtain medical insurance and life 
insurance there. Despite Patient C’s and the insurance company’s repeated requests between September 
2015 and May 2016, Dr. Tamari failed to provide Patient C’s records. In the course of the College 
investigation, a detailed chronology was received setting out multiple attempts made between September 
2015 and October 2016 by the third party retained by Patient C’s insurer to obtain the required medical 
information. The Attending Physician’s Statement requested by the insurer was received from Dr. Tamari on 
November 16, 2016. On January 3, 2017, Patient C advised that Dr. Tamari had provided his medical 
records in December 2016.   
Mr. Y 
 
In May 2016, Mr. Y, whose children were patients of Dr. Tamari, complained to the College of the 
difficulties he experienced over the past year in attempting to arrange an appointment with Dr. Tamari to 
discuss and receive updated information regarding his children’s health. Specifically, Dr. Tamari had not 
responded to repeated telephone calls by Mr. Y between March 22 and May 15, 2016. Dr. Tamari’s office 
contacted Mr. Y in mid-June 2016, after receiving notification of his complaint to the College, and provided 
an appointment with Dr. Tamari on June 24. Mr. Y expressed concerns about Dr. Tamari’s aggressive 
communications during that appointment. Despite multiple requests made by the College in August, 
October, and December 2016, Dr. Tamari did not respond to the complaint.   
 
Patient D 
 
Patient D and her four family members were patients of Dr. Tamari. In March 2017, Patient D complained to 
the College that Dr. Tamari failed to transfer her family’s medical records to their new doctor (Dr. X) after 
numerous requests and failed to respond to a request by Patient D’s family member’s insurer for an 
Attending Physician’s Statement. In April 2017, the College received information from the insurer regarding 
the Attending Physician’s Statement; Dr. X also informed the College that she sent written requests for the 
complainants’ medical records, including authorization to release forms, to Dr. Tamari in June 2016.  
 
In March 2017, the College investigator notified Dr. Tamari of the complaint and requested a response and a 
copy of the complainants’ records for 2015-2017. Reminder letters were sent in May 2017. Dr. Tamari’s 
counsel requested an extension to respond in May and again in June. After the second deadline, Dr. Tamari 
was requested to respond by July 4, 2017. On July 13, 2017, Dr. Tamari’s counsel provided a CD with the 
medical records for Patient D and two of her family members, indicating that the records for the other two 
family members would follow as Dr. Tamari had challenges providing the records, including computer 
problems. The received records could be viewed, but they could not be printed without a password, which 
was unknown. Test results and lab reports for the two remaining family members were provided on July 24, 
2017. The clinical notes were not provided as Dr. Tamari’s computer had been infected with a virus, which 
prevented retrieval of the electronic medical records. On August 23, 2017, the College investigator requested 
copies of all medical records and the Cumulative Patient Profile for each family member. On September 28, 
2017, Dr. Tamari’s counsel provided a further copy of medical records for Patient D, and her two family 
members. On October 27, 2017, a further request was made. On November 2, 2017, Dr. X advised that as of 
that date, no records were received from Dr. Tamari. On November 7, 2017, Patient D’s family member’s 
insurance application was denied because the insurer did not receive all of the information they required. 
 
Patient E 
 
In July 2017, Patient E, Dr. Tamari’s patient of 24 years, complained to the College that Dr. Tamari failed to 
provide a necessary form to her insurer within 90 days, as they had discussed. In late July 2016, she became 
ill and needed to apply for mortgage insurance benefits. In September 2016 she asked Dr. Tamari to 
complete a form for her insurer. In early January 2017, Dr. Tamari advised Patient E that he had faxed the 
form to the insurer. When she contacted Dr. Tamari’s office several days later, she was told that Dr. Tamari 
would be re-faxing the forms from his home office. According to Patient E, the insurer never received the 
necessary documentation and her file was closed. In April 2017, Patient E requested a copy of her medical 
records from Dr. Tamari. As of January 4, 2018, Patient E confirmed that she had not received her medical 
records. Dr. Tamari was notified of the complaint on August 8, 2017 and was requested to respond on 
August 16, 2017. Upon his counsel’s request, he was granted an extension to respond by September 22, 
2017. On October 27, 2017, College investigator again requested Dr. Tamari’s response to Patient E’s 
complaint. On December 8, 2017, the records were provided to the College.  
 
Patient F 
 
Patient F, who was a patient of Dr. Tamari since the early 1990’s, was a pedestrian involved in a motor 
vehicle accident in May 2016 when he was struck by a truck. Patient F saw Dr. Tamari a few times in a six-
month period, but needed to see Dr. Tamari more frequently to address his health issues. Despite attempts, 
he was not able to do so owing to Dr. Tamari’s availability.  Patient F found a new family doctor (Dr. Y) in 
May 2017. Patient F and Dr. Y requested that Patient F’s medical records be transferred to Dr. Y. Dr. Y 
advised the College that a release of records request was completed on May 23, 2017 and faxed to Dr. 
Tamari’s office the following day.  After repeated verbal and written requests, a copy of Patient F’s chart 
was provided to him on July 28, 2017 and Patient F brought the records to Dr. Y on August 3, 2017. In July 
2017, Patient F complained to the College and Dr. Tamari was notified of the complaint on August 8, 2017.  
On August 16, 2017, College investigator requested a response and, on August 22, 2017, Dr. Tamari’s 
counsel requested an extension to provide the response to September 22, 2017, which was granted.  The 
College received a copy of Dr. Tamari’s clinical notes and records for Patient F on September 28, 2017.   
 
Patient G 
 
In August 2017, Patient G and his wife, Dr. Tamari’s patients since 1987, were notified by Dr. Tamari that 
he had closed his family practice. In January 2018, Patient G complained to the College that on August 23, 
2017 he sent a letter to Dr. Tamari’s office, as per the instructions in Dr. Tamari’s letter, requesting copies of 
his and his wife’s medical records.  Patient G called both Dr. Tamari’s old office and his new office on 
numerous occasions from September 2017 to January 2018 and was told by Dr. Tamari’s staff that Dr. 
Tamari had received his request and was working on it.  The College investigator notified Dr. Tamari of the 
complaint in January 2018 and requested his response and a copy of the medical records. Dr. Tamari’s 
counsel advised that she was working on obtaining his response. Reminder letters were sent on April 2 and 
24. Dr. Tamari’s response, received on May 8, indicated that his efforts to obtain the records have been 
complicated owing to a corrupted EMR, that he is attempting to resolve this issue, and will provide records 
as soon as he is able.    
 
Patient H 
 
In July 2017, Patient H and his wife, Dr. Tamari’s patients since 1990, were notified that Dr. Tamari had 
closed his family practice. They found a new family physician, Dr. Z, in August and release forms were 
faxed to Dr. Tamari’s office that month. In October 2017 Patient H complained to the College that no 
response was received from Dr. Tamari’s office and the release forms were re-faxed by Dr. Z on two 
different dates in October 2017.  As of February 20, 2018, Dr. Z had not received Dr. Tamari’s medical 
records.  In his complaint, Patient H stated that his wife has suffered from migraines for many years and, as a 
result, it is important for her new physician to know what tests have been conducted and what treatments 
have been attempted. The College investigator notified Dr. Tamari of the complaint in November 2017 and, 
in February 2018, requested Dr. Tamari’s response and a copy of the complainants’ medical records. 
Reminder letters were sent in March and April. Dr. Tamari’s response, received on May 8, indicated that his 
efforts to obtain the records have been complicated owing to a corrupted EMR, that he is attempting to 
resolve this issue and will provide records as soon as he is able.    
 
Patient I 
 
In August 2017, Patient I and his family, Dr. Tamari’s patients since approximately 1987 and 1990s, were 
notified that Dr. Tamari had closed his family practice. Patient I had left Dr. Tamari’s practice in May 2017 
due to repeated cancelled appointments by Dr. Tamari and, as a result, poor management of Patient I’s 
health. On August 17, shortly after receiving Dr. Tamari’s letter, Patient I hand-delivered 4 written requests 
for the family’s medical records to Dr. Tamari’s receptionist, made numerous monthly calls and left 
messages with Dr. Tamari’s receptionist over the following months. Patient I suffers from a chronic 
condition and his new family physician, believes that a request for medical records was sent by her office in 
May 2017, when he first became a patient. As of May 2018, records had not been received by Dr. the new 
family physician or by Patient I. In February 2018, Patient I complained to the College. The College 
investigator notified Dr. Tamari of the complaint and requested Dr. Tamari’s response and a copy of the 
complainants’ medical records in March 2018.  A reminder letter was sent in April. Dr. Tamari’s response, 
received on May 8, indicated that his efforts to obtain the records have been complicated owing to a 
corrupted EMR, that he is attempting to resolve this issue and will provide records as soon as he is able.     
 
Patient J 
 
In July 2017, Patient J, Dr. Tamari’s patient since 1993, was notified that Dr. Tamari had closed his family 
practice. Patient J found a new family physician in August and a release form was faxed to Dr. Tamari’s 
office that month requesting a summary of his medical records, relevant consult and lab reports and 
immunization records. Following the written request, Patient J made numerous calls to Dr. Tamari in 
September, October, December, January and March. On each of these calls, Dr. Tamari’s staff confirmed 
that the messages were being relayed to Dr. Tamari. In March 2018, Patient J complained to the College. 
The College investigator notified Dr. Tamari of the complaint and requested Dr. Tamari’s response and a 
copy of the complainant’s medical records on March 28, 2018. Dr. Tamari’s response, received on May 8, 
indicated that his efforts to obtain the records have been complicated owing to a corrupted EMR, that he is 
attempting to resolve this issue and will provide records as soon as he is able.      
 
Administration and Management of Practice  
 
Except Patient F, all the complainant’s medical records that Dr. Tamari provided to the College were 
incomplete and/or illegible. Dr. Tamari failed to take appropriate measures to back up his medical records 
when he converted from paper charts to electronic medical records. As a result, when a number of patient 
charts were corrupted the records were lost in their entirety. Several of the patients listed above described 
difficulties in scheduling appointments with Dr. Tamari’s office, issues with the messaging service and that 
staff was not available or unresponsive to inquiries for records or booking appointments. Particularly 
important were communication and coverage, since Dr. Tamari was absent, intermittently, from his practice 
over the years. This mismanagement impacted his patients’ access to care.  
 
Breach of Discipline Committee Order 
 
In May 2012, following the Discipline Committee’s finding that Dr. Tamari committed professional 
misconduct, terms, conditions and limitations were imposed on Dr. Tamari’s certificate of registration, 
requiring, among other things, that Dr. Tamari maintain a log of all requests received for third party reports 
and medical records indicating when such requests were made and when they were fulfilled. The College’s 
investigations revealed that Dr. Tamari had failed to maintain a complete and accurate Log of all requests for 
third party reports and medical records, and responses to such requests with respect to Patients B, C, D, E, F, 
G, H, I and J and their families.   
 
Provision of Information to Hospital  
 
In January 2017, Dr. Tamari completed and submitted his re-appointment application to the Hospital, where 
he had held hospital privileges for several decades. He answered “No” to the question of whether he was the 
subject of any complaint, investigation, or review by a licensing body, despite the fact that he was the 
subject of at least four College investigations as of January 2017 and other College investigations in 2016. 
 
 
Previous College History 
 
In May 2012, the Discipline Committee found and Dr. Tamari admitted that he had engaged in disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, in that he failed to respond in a timely manner to repeated requests 
by an insurance company for his patient’s medical records in order to process her travel insurance claim in 
2009. The Committee ordered a one-month suspension of his certificate of registration. He was also required 
to undergo a preceptorship in practice management for no less than six months, followed by a reassessment, 
and to maintain a log of requests for third party reports and medical records, indicating when such requests 
were made and when they were fulfilled.   
 
In April 2000, Dr. Tamari’s certificate of registration was suspended for one month after the Discipline 
Committee found that he engaged in professional misconduct, in that Dr. Tamari: 
- failed to provide a report of an examination or treatment performed by him to his patient within a 
 reasonable time after the patient had requested such a report; 
- failed to respond to repeated requests for a patient’s medical records from an insurance company, the 
 patient, the patient’s employer and the College over a period of fourteen months; and   
- failed to respond appropriately or within a reasonable time to a written inquiry from the College.   
  
 Upon review of the College investigation results, which revealed that Dr. Tamari had failed to transfer the 
 medical records of a patient and her children to their new physician despite several requests for over four 
 months, the Complaints Committee required that Dr. Tamari attend in person to be cautioned about his 
 disregard for his patients requests for their medical records. After his failing to respond to numerous 
 attempts to schedule this attendance, a date was selected without his input.  As a result, the Discipline 
 Committee found that Dr. Tamari failed to attend at the College at the appointed time which, according to 
 the Discipline Committee, showed blatant disregard for the self-governance of the medical profession.   
 
In March 1996, following the College investigation of Dr. Tamari’s former patient’s complaint that he failed 
to transfer her and her children’s medical records to her new physician in a timely manner and that as a 
result of his inappropriate transfer, the original medical records were lost, the Complaints Committee: 
- cautioned Dr. Tamari in person about his failure to cooperate with the College during the investigation; 
- cautioned Dr. Tamari in writing about the importance of patient records and the need to respond to 
  requests for the transfer of records in a timely and professional manner; and 
- counselled Dr. Tamari about his obligation to retain patient records for at least 10 years and to transfer 
  only copies of records, while maintaining originals in a secure location for the prescribed period of time. 
 
In May 1991, following a complaint by a patient that he failed to maintain the standard and failed to provide 
a record, the Complaints Committee counselled Dr. Tamari in writing. Upon further investigation, directed 
by the Health Disciplines Board following the complainant’s appeal, the Complaints Committee: 
 - counselled Dr. Tamari in writing about the importance of effective communication with patients 
  following discharge from hospital; and  
 - directed that Dr. Tamari be admonished in person about the importance of undertaking and his personal 
  responsibility to ensure the transfer of requested records within reasonable time, and to do so on an urgent 
  priority basis, where there is indication that records are required for imminent treatment purposes.  
 
Dr. Tamari’s Health and Change in Scope of Practice 
 
Since March 2017, Dr. Tamari has been under the care of a new psychiatrist, who reached a new primary 
diagnosis with respect to Dr. Tamari, which was different from Dr. Tamari’s past diagnosis. The psychiatrist 
started a new treatment regime and Dr. Tamari has been under this treatment for approximately one year. 
 
In January 2018, Dr. Tamari entered into a four-year health monitoring contract with the Ontario Medical 
Association’s Physician Health Program (PHP) which requires, among other things: meetings with his new 
psychiatrist and compliance with clinical advice and guidance; regular meetings with a PHP Monitor; 
monitoring of his behaviour in the workplace by a workplace monitor; and remaining under the care of a 
designated family physician. On January 29, 2018, Dr. Tamari signed an undertaking with the College 
agreeing to abide by the terms of the January 2018 PHP contract. 
 
In March 2018, Dr. Tamari’s new psychiatrist reported that Dr. Tamari’s repeated pattern of behaviour, 
which continued unabated for a number of years, had a significant impact on his work that is necessary to 
run his day-to-day operation (i.e. patients’ correspondence, paperwork, and practice organization) and that 
Dr. Tamari has displayed significant improvement as evidenced by his ability to cope with unforeseen 
circumstances in his interpersonal life. In a letter dated April 19, 2018, the PHP notes satisfaction with Dr. 
Tamari’s progress in the monitoring program and with his commitment to his ongoing well-being, 
confirming that he has been completely compliant with all aspects of his monitoring program.   
 
Dr. Tamari advises that he has put in measures with a view to preventing recurrence of his unprofessional 
behaviour, including: a structure and routine for addressing his administrative tasks during a part of each 
day; adherence to a limited, regular exercise routine; and a change in his work structure. In July 2017, Dr. 
Tamari closed his solo family medicine practice and now shares office space and administrative support with 
a family physician. His scope of practice is limited to minor surgical procedures and surgical assisting 
which, according to Dr. Tamari, reduces the administrative tasks in his practice that were primarily 
responsible for his previous conduct.  
 
Dr. Tamari acknowledges that, throughout the time in which he practised family medicine, as well as in the 
closing of his family practice, he has repeatedly failed to provide medical records and reports/forms to 
patients and to third parties in a timely manner, including with respect to patients other than those specified 
above and has taken steps to rectify these issues. 
 
Disposition 
 
On June 13, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered that:  
       
-  the Registrar suspend Dr. Tamari’s certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months commencing 
   immediately. 
-  the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Tamari’s certificate of 
   registration: 
    
    -  Dr. Tamari shall not engage in the practice of general family medicine or be the primary care 
       provider for any patient whatsoever; 
    -  Dr. Tamari’s practice shall be restricted to: 
        -  performing minor surgical procedures in an office-based setting.  This includes assessing and 
           preparing a patient for the minor procedure, as well as providing follow-up and treatment of 
           related complications stemming from those procedures; and 
        -  surgical assisting in a hospital-based setting, provided that a member of the College of 
           Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario is in attendance and performing the surgery;  
    -  Commencing immediately, Dr. Tamari shall maintain a log of all requests for medical records and 
       third party reports made by patients, other physicians or third parties.  The log shall indicate when 
       such requests were made and when they were fulfilled (the “Log”), and Dr. Tamari shall submit 
       this Log to the College on a monthly basis for an indefinite period of time.  For greater clarity, Dr. 
       Tamari is responsible for maintaining the Log and submitting it to the College during the time that 
       his certificate of registration is suspended; 
    -  Within sixty (60) days of the date of the receipt of valid patient consent, Dr. Tamari shall deliver 
       all existing medical records to all patients and/or third parties included in the Notice of Hearing, 
       including the medical records of those family members referenced in the underlying complaints of 
       the patients included in the Notice of Hearing.  The receipt of patient consents and delivery of 
       medical records to the patients and family members addressed in this paragraph, shall be included 
       in the Log, referenced in paragraph above; 
    -  Dr. Tamari shall retain and employ an administrative assistant who will be present at all times that 
       Dr. Tamari is practising in his office; 
    -  Dr. Tamari shall participate in and successfully complete one-on-one individualized educational 
       instruction in ethics with an instructor approved by the College, and provide proof thereof to the 
       College within six (6) months of the date of this Order;  
    -  Upon his return to practice, Dr. Tamari shall practise under the supervision of a College-approved 
       supervisor or supervisors (the “Supervisor(s)”) who will sign an undertaking in the form attached 
       as Schedule “A” to the Order.  For a period of twelve (12) months thereafter, the Supervisor shall 
       supervise the management of Dr. Tamari’s practice.  The supervision of his practice management 
       shall contain the following elements: 
          -  The Supervisor will meet with Dr. Tamari in person a minimum of once a month; 
          -  The Supervisor will review the Log and corresponding charts, as necessary, to ensure the 
             timely provision of complete records and reports, and, in addition, ten (10) current patient 
             charts selected on a random basis by the Supervisor to ensure accessibility, legibility and 
             completeness;  
          -  Dr. Tamari shall fully cooperate with, and shall abide by any recommendations of his 
             Supervisor, including any recommended practice management improvements and ongoing 
             professional development; 
          -  The Supervisor will submit written reports to the College, at minimum, once per month, for 
             the first three (3) months, and every other month thereafter; 
          -  If a Supervisor who has given an undertaking in the form attached at Schedule “A” to the 
             Order is unwilling or unable to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. Tamari shall, within twenty 
             (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from 
             a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to 
             the College within that time; 
    -  Dr. Tamari  shall  inform  the  College  of  each  and  every  location  where  he  practises  in  any 
       jurisdiction  (his  “Practice  Location(s)”)  within  five  (5)  days  of  returning  to  practice  and  shall 
       inform  the College of  any and  all new Practice  Locations within five (5) days of commencing 
       practice at that location. 
    -  Dr.  Tamari  shall  submit  to,  and  not  interfere  with,  unannounced  inspections  of  his  Practice 
       Location(s)  and  patient  charts  by  a  College  representative  for  the  purposes  of  monitoring  and 
       enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order. 
    -  Dr. Tamari shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the terms of 
       this Order. 
    -  Dr. Tamari  shall  consent  to  the College  making  enquiries of the  Ontario  Health  Insurance Plan 
       and/or  any  person  who  or  institution  that  may  have  relevant  information,  including  his 
       administrative assistant, in order for the College to monitor and enforce his compliance with the 
       terms of this Order.  
-  Dr. Tamari attend before the panel to be reprimanded.  
-  Dr. Tamari pay to the College costs in the amount of $10,180.00, within ninety (90) days of the date of 
   this Order.

Hearing Date(s): June 13 2018


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 May 2012
Summary:

On May 18, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Erez Tamari committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Tamari failed to respond in a 
timely manner to a request for medical records related to his patient made repeatedly by an 
insurance company in 2009 for the purpose of processing the patient's claim under her travel 
insurance policy. Dr. Tamari admitted the allegation. 
 
Patient X incurred a claim while travelling under travel medical emergency insurance. On April 
2, 2009, the insurance company sent a fax to Dr. Tamari's office requesting Patient X's medical 
records in order to process the claim. The fax was marked "urgent" and "please reply" and was 
received by Dr. Tamari's office.   
 
The insurance company sent multiple faxes to Dr. Tamari requesting the medical records. The 
company's records state that between April 8, 2009 and September 30, 2009, employees placed 
over two dozen calls to Dr. Tamari's office to follow up on the request for Patient X's medical 
records.  
Dr. Tamari provided the requested records to the insurance company in mid-November 2009.  
Therefore, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
1.    the Registrar suspend Dr. Tamari's Certificate of Registration for a four week period, to 
commence at 11:59 p.m. on June 18, 2012; 
 
2.    the Registrar impose as terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Tamari's certificate of 
registration for an indefinite period or for the specified periods of time set out herein: 
 
a.    Dr. Tamari shall maintain a log of requests for third party reports and medical records, 
which shall indicate when such requests were made and when they were fulfilled (the "Log"); 
 
b.    Dr. Tamari shall participate in and successfully complete an educational program in 
practice management with a preceptor who is to be approved by the College in its sole discretion 
and who has within forty-five days of the date of this Order signed an Undertaking to the College 
in the form attached hereto as Schedule "A". Termination of the preceptorship shall be at the sole 
discretion of the College, but shall in any case not occur until either six (6) months have passed, 
or two positive successive reports from the preceptor have been received by the College, 
whichever occurs later. Dr. Tamari shall abide by all recommendations of his preceptor with 
respect to practice improvements and/or professional development;  
 
c.    Within twelve (12) months of completing the preceptorship required by paragraph 2(b) 
above, Dr. Tamari shall undergo a re-assessment with regard to practice management by a 
College-appointed Assessor. The assessment will include a review of Dr. Tamari's Log. Dr. 
Tamari shall abide by all recommendations with regard to practice management made by the 
College-appointed Assessor. The Assessor shall report the results of this assessment to the 
College; 
 
d.    Dr. Tamari shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient 
charts by a College representative(s) for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance 
with the terms of this Order; 
 
e.    Dr. Tamari shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing the 
terms of this Order. 
 
3.    Dr. Tamari attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
 
4.    Dr. Tamari shall, within 30 days, pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the 
amount of $3,650.00. 
 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 18, 2012


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Apr 2000
Summary:

 On April 3, 2000, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Tamari(s plea of guilty and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct in that he failed to respond appropriately or within a 
 reasonable time to a written inquiry from the College and that he failed without reasonable cause 
 to provide a report or certificate relating to an examination or treatment performed by him to the 
 patient or his or her authorized representative within a reasonable time after the patient or his 
 or her authorized representative had requested such a report or certificate.  The Committee 
 subsequently ordered the following penalty:

1)	A reprimand, with the fact of the reprimand to be 
 recorded on the register;
2)	Dr. Tamari(s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of 
 one month to commence May 1, 2000;
3)	That the suspension shall be suspended if prior to May 1, 
 2000, Dr. Tamari provides his written consent to an inspection of his practice by an inspector on 
 behalf of the College appointed by the Registrar, the costs of which be paid by Dr. Tamari to a 
 maximum of $1,200.00, and if the inspection itself occurs prior to May 1, 2000;
4)	The inspection 
 report shall be provided to the Registrar and the Executive Committee, and that the Executive 
 Committee shall take such further action as it is empowered to do and as many be necessary on the 
 basis of the report; and
5)	Dr. Tamari shall pay the College its costs in the amount of $7,000.00 
 within six months of the date of this order (April 3, 2000).

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 03, 2000

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On January 17, 2012, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Brampton, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Tamari.