Tamayo Estrada, Catalina Maria (CPSO#: 88458)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Pontificia Bolivariana, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton Kids Clinic
Building C, Unit 1
604 Santa Maria Blvd
Milton ON  L9T 9L7
Phone: (905) 878-0055
Fax: (905) 878-0544
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

725 Bronte Street South
Milton District Hospital
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Canada
Phone: 905 878 2383
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Tamayo Estrada Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tamayo Estrada ( CPSO# 88458 )

Business Address:
101 - 450 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 8T2
Phone Number: (905) 878-9720

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Colombia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATALINA MARIA TAMAYO ESTRADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMAYO ESTRADA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2012