Tambay, Robert (CPSO#: 77181)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
29-1910 St Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone: (613) 686-6656
Fax: (613) 248-9009
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Tambay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tambay ( CPSO# 77181 )

Business Address:
1910 St. Laurent Boulevard
Suite 29
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 686-6656

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Nov 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT TAMBAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMBAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2001