Tamir, Diana (CPSO#: 78015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Dept of Anesthesia & Pain Mgnt
200 Elizabeth Street
E N 3 462
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5164
Fax: (416) 340-3698
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weinberg and Tamir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Weinberg ( CPSO# 81057 )
Dr. D. Tamir ( CPSO# 78015 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia & Pain Management
EN 3-464- 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5164

Business Address:
3rd Floor
Room 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 848-7665

Business Address:
M4 and M5
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Business Address:
1255 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 1E2

Business Address:
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANA TAMIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Mar 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007