Tan, Christopher You Keng (CPSO#: 86276)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7130 Warden Ave. Suite 207
Markham ON  L3R 1S2
Phone: (905) 470-1117
Fax: (905) 470-1115
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Y. K. Tan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tan ( CPSO# 86276 )

Business Address:
207 - 7130 Warden Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1S2
Phone Number: (905) 470-1117

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER YOU KENG TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009