Tan, Kong Teng (CPSO#: 79902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Malay

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
PMB 1-293
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: 4163404800 Ext. 6166
Fax: (416) 593-0502
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. KT Tan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tan ( CPSO# 79902 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 823-0929

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
PMB 1-293
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 823-0929

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 08 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KONG TENG TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 24 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2007