Tan, Richard Yoh (CPSO#: 75946)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 155
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 256-8338
Fax: (519) 258-7337
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Yoh Tan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tan ( CPSO# 75946 )

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-1661

Business Address:
155 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 256-8338

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD YOH TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 02 Apr 2001 to 04 May 2001
Elective Trainee - Respirology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2003