Tandon, Anu (CPSO#: 76373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A459
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4758
Fax: (416) 480-5153
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

303-1835 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 792-9436
Fax: (416) 792-9438
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashis Chawla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chawla ( CPSO# 76411 )
Dr. A. Tandon ( CPSO# 76373 )

Business Address:
501 - 2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone Number: (647) 435-8831

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6126


Corporation Name: Dr. Anu Tandon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chawla ( CPSO# 76411 )
Dr. A. Tandon ( CPSO# 76373 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A459
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4758

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 12 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANU TANDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2005