Taneja, Ravi (CPSO#: 71867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Armed Forces Medical College, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus
Department of Anaesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road P O Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 32846
Fax: (519) 663-2957
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Taneja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Marwaha ( CPSO# 80623 )
Dr. R. Taneja ( CPSO# 71867 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 2C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 27 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAVI TANEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANEJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 May 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2009