Tang, Alan Chi-Luen (CPSO#: 60901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 10
165 Plymouth Road
Welland ON  L3B 3E1
Phone: (905) 788-1711
Fax: (905) 788-2332
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Tang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tang ( CPSO# 60901 )

Business Address:
10 - 165 Plymouth Road
Welland ON  L3B 3E1
Phone Number: (905) 788-1711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN CHI-LUEN TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1990