Tang, Christine Mei See (CPSO#: 108889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MEI SEE TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2018