Tang, Ephraim Shin-Tian (CPSO#: 95587)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Multi-Organ transplant Program
University Hospital, LHSC
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A5A5
Phone: 2265031204
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Oregon

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EPHRAIM SHIN-TIAN TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016