Tang, Lan (CPSO#: 94364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 May 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Huabei Medical College, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 57
10909 Yonge St.
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3E3
Phone: 905-237-6697
Fax: 905-237-7987
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lan Tang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tang ( CPSO# 94364 )

Business Address:
Unit 57
10909 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3E3
Phone Number: (905) 237-6697

Medical Records Location

Address: Unimedico Family Practice Unit 110 955 Major Mackenzie Drive West Vaughan, ON L6A 4P9 Tel: 289 553 3300 Fax: 289 553 2600
Instructions: Patients who were treated at Unimedico Family Practice may contact this clinic for medical record inquiries.
Date Received: 11 Dec 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Jun 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Lan Tang may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.