Tang, Shangguo (CPSO#: 85245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Luzhou Medical College, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Pathology
2N27 Health Sciences Centre
1200 Main St., West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 42019
Fax: (905) 521-2338
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 684-7271 Ext. 46226
Fax: (905) 984-5578
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

1230 North Shore Blvd
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3737 Ext. 1214
Fax: (905) 336-6483
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 15 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANGGUO TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2009