Tang-Wai, David France (CPSO#: 80259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Neurology
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street 5WW-441
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5181
Fax: (416) 603-5768
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Tang-Wai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tang-Wai ( CPSO# 80259 )

Business Address:
Division of Neurology
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street 5WW-441
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5181

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 18 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID FRANCE TANG-WAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG-WAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005